There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution marking the fifth anniversary of Ukraine's Revolution of Dignity by honoring the bravery, determination, and sacrifice of the people of Ukraine during and since the Revolution, and condemning continued Russian aggression against Ukraine.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4860-4864; text: CR S4863-4864)
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
02/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date
07/16/2019S.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2019S.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S4862-4863; text: CR S4862-4863) To amend the preamble.
07/16/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4860-4864; text: CR S4863-4864)
07/16/2019The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2019S.Amdt.926 Amendment SA 926 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2019S.Amdt.926 Amendment SA 926 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S4861-4862; text: CR S4861-4862) In the nature of a substitute.
07/16/2019Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
06/03/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103.
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/22/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
02/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/14/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
06/03/2019 Reported by

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.74 - A resolution marking the fifth anniversary of Ukraine's Revolution of Dignity by honoring the bravery, determination, and sacrifice of the people of Ukraine during and since the Revolution, and condemning continued Russian aggression against Ukraine.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.