There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Firearm Risk Protection Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the sale of a firearm to, and the purchase of a firearm by, a person who is not covered by appropriate liability insurance coverage.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/23/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/12/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 05/11/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/11/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/23/2021 Referred to

As of 06/15/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1004 - Firearm Risk Protection Act of 2021


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1004. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2021)

Firearm Risk Protection Act of 2021

This bill establishes requirements for gun purchasers and gun owners to be covered by a qualified liability insurance policy.

A qualified liability insurance policy, with respect to a firearm purchaser, is a policy that covers losses resulting from use of the firearm while it is owned by the purchaser.

A person who fails to comply with the requirements is subject to a criminal fine of up to $10,000.