There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Gun Show Loophole Closing Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require criminal background checks on all firearms transactions occurring at gun shows.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/23/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/23/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 02/23/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/16/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/11/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/23/2021 Referred to

As of 06/23/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1006 - Gun Show Loophole Closing Act of 2021


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1006. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2021)

Gun Show Loophole Closing Act of 2021

This bill establishes new requirements regarding firearm transfers at gun shows.

Specifically, the bill requires the following:

  • a person who operates a gun show must meet certain requirements (e.g., minimum age and registration); and
  • a firearm transfer between private parties at a gun show must be facilitated by a licensed gun dealer, importer, or manufacturer in compliance with certain background check and recordkeeping requirements.