There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Life at Conception Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement equal protection under the 14th article of amendment to the Constitution for the right to life of each born and preborn human person.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/23/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 02/11/2021
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Carl, Jerry L. [R-AL-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Mann, Tracey [R-KS-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Feenstra, Randy [R-IA-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Greene, Marjorie Taylor [R-GA-14]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Good, Bob [R-VA-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Moore, Barry [R-AL-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Rosendale Sr., Matthew M. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Herrell, Yvette [R-NM-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Miller, Mary E. [R-IL-15]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Boebert, Lauren [R-CO-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 02/22/2021
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 03/09/2021
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/26/2021
Rep. Fischbach, Michelle [R-MN-7] 03/26/2021
Rep. Garcia, Mike [R-CA-25] 04/01/2021
Rep. Franklin, C. Scott [R-FL-15] 04/08/2021
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-50] 04/08/2021
Rep. Steel, Michelle [R-CA-48] 04/16/2021
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/07/2021
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/07/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/11/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/23/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1011. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2021)

Life at Conception Act

This bill declares that the right to life guaranteed by the Constitution is vested in each human being at all stages of life, including the moment of fertilization, cloning, or other moment at which an individual comes into being.

Nothing in this bill shall be construed to authorize the prosecution of any woman for the death of her unborn child.