There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To support United States international cyber diplomacy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/20/2021Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended.(consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1984-1988)
02/23/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/22/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
04/20/2021-6:20pmHousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1984-1988)
04/20/2021-6:20pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 1251 are considered vacated.
04/19/2021-6:00pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/19/2021-5:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1251.
04/19/2021-5:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1930-1934; text: CR H1930-1933)
04/19/2021-5:47pmHouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/25/2021HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/25/2021HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/23/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/23/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/23/2021 Referred to
02/25/2021 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations04/22/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/23/2021)

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2021

This bill establishes requirements related to diplomatic engagement with foreign countries on matters of U.S. cyberspace policy.

Specifically, the bill establishes the Bureau of International Cyberspace Policy within the Department of State to advise the State Department on cyberspace issues and lead diplomatic efforts on issues related to international cybersecurity, internet access and freedom, and international cyber threats.

The bureau must undertake specified duties and responsibilities to implement the stated U.S. policy of working internationally to promote an open, interoperable, and secure internet governed by a multi-stakeholder model that (1) promotes human rights, democracy, and rule of law; and (2) respects privacy and guards against deception, fraud, and theft.

The President must devise a strategy for U.S. engagement with foreign governments on international norms related to responsible state behavior in cyberspace. Further, the President is encouraged to enter into executive arrangements with foreign governments that support U.S. cyberspace policy.

In addition, annual country reports on human rights practices must include assessments of freedom of expression in each country with respect to electronic information, and the Government Accountability Office must report on U.S. diplomatic processes and other efforts with foreign countries to advance U.S. interests in cyberspace.