There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Effective Suicide Screening and Assessment in the Emergency Department Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Effective Suicide Screening and Assessment in the Emergency Department Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a program to improve the identification, assessment, and treatment of patients in hospital emergency departments who are at risk of suicide, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/12/2021Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981.(consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2239-2240)
02/25/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/13/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/12/2021-5:39pmHousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981. (consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2239-2240)
05/12/2021-5:39pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 380, proceedings on H.R. 1324 are considered vacated.
05/11/2021-3:30pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/11/2021-3:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1324.
05/11/2021-3:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2171-2172; text: CR H2171)
05/11/2021-3:20pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/26/2021HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/25/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/26/2021
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/11/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/26/2021 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/13/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/12/2021)

Effective Suicide Screening and Assessment in the Emergency Department Act of 2021

This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to hospitals to improve their capacity to identify patients in emergency departments who are at risk of suicide and connect those patients with mental health treatments and services.