There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a study on the efficacy and potential negative impacts of masks to human health, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
04/28/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/26/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/19/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/26/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary02/25/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/28/2021 Referred to

As of 06/24/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1342 - To authorize a study on the efficacy and potential negative impacts of masks to human health, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1342. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2021)

This bill requires the Government Accountability Office to study the efficacy and adverse impacts of wearing masks to reduce the spread of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

This study must specifically address

  • the effectiveness of masks in preventing COVID-19 compared to less restrictive measures;
  • safety concerns with the types of masks commonly worn, including N-95 and medical masks; and
  • the potential negative health impacts of wearing masks.