There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Mental Health Justice Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award grants to States and political subdivisions of States to hire, employ, train, and dispatch mental health professionals to respond in lieu of law enforcement officers in emergencies involving one or more persons with a mental illness or an intellectual or developmental disability, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
04/28/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/03/2021Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1021)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 02/25/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/25/2021
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 02/25/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 02/25/2021
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 03/01/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 03/01/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/01/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 03/01/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 03/02/2021
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/02/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/02/2021
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 03/02/2021
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/02/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/02/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/02/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/02/2021
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/02/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/08/2021
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 03/08/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 03/08/2021
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/08/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/08/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/16/2021
Rep. Mrvan, Frank J. [D-IN-1] 03/16/2021
Rep. Manning, Kathy E. [D-NC-6] 03/16/2021
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 04/12/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 04/12/2021
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 04/16/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2021
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/16/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/16/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/16/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/22/2021
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/22/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/22/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/22/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/13/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/13/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/13/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/13/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/13/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/28/2021
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/28/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/28/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/28/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 06/04/2021
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/15/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/15/2021
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/15/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 06/15/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/26/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary02/25/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/28/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1368. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2021)

Mental Health Justice Act of 2021

This bill creates a grant program for states and local governments to train and dispatch mental health professionals to respond, instead of law enforcement officers, to emergencies that involve people with behavioral health needs.

The Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration (SAMHSA) must manage the program in consultation with the Department of Justice (DOJ). SAMHSA may cancel grants that increase incarceration or institutionalization. Grantees must use funds for purposes including de-escalation and anti-racism training.

The Department of Health and Human Services and the DOJ must evaluate this program.