There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize funding to increase access to mental health care treatment to reduce gun violence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
03/01/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/02/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/04/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/23/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/04/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/02/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary01/04/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/01/2021 Referred to

As of 06/15/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.137 - Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2021


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/04/2021)

Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2021

This bill authorizes FY2022 appropriations for the Department of Justice, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Social Security Administration to (1) increase access to mental health care treatment and services, and (2) promote reporting of mental health information to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System.