There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ghost Guns Are Guns Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to require firearm assembly kits to be considered to be firearms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/01/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/28/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/01/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/01/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/01/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 03/01/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17] 03/03/2021
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/08/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/09/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 03/26/2021
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 03/26/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/26/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/01/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/28/2021 Referred to

As of 06/20/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1454 - Ghost Guns Are Guns Act


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1454. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/01/2021)

Ghost Guns Are Guns Act

This bill broadens the definition of firearm for purposes of federal firearms laws.

Specifically, it includes as a firearm any combination of parts designed or intended to be used to convert a device into a firearm and from which a firearm may be readily assembled.