There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ending Qualified Immunity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Revised Statutes to remove the defense of qualified immunity in the case of any action under section 1979, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/01/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/28/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/01/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/01/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15]* 03/01/2021
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/01/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/03/2021
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/09/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/17/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/29/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/01/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/28/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1470. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/01/2021)

Ending Qualified Immunity Act

This bill eliminates the defense of qualified immunity in civil actions for deprivation of rights. Qualified immunity is a judicially created doctrine that protects government employees or those acting with state authority from being held personally liable for constitutional violations.

The bill provides that under the statute allowing a civil action alleging deprivation of rights under color of law, it shall not be a defense or immunity to any such action that (1) the defendant was acting in good faith or believed that his or her conduct was lawful at the time it was committed; (2) the rights, privileges, or immunities secured by the Constitution or federal laws were not clearly established at the time of their deprivation; or (3) the state of the law was such that the defendant could not reasonably have been expected to know whether his or her conduct was lawful.