There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to increase transparency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 4 (Roll no. 115).(text: 04/14/2021 CR H1767)
03/02/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/19/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
04/15/2021-9:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2021-9:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 4 (Roll no. 115). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1767)
04/15/2021-8:39pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1834)
04/14/2021-2:42pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/14/2021-2:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1487.
04/14/2021-2:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1767-1769)
04/14/2021-2:31pmHouseMs. Craig moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/02/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
03/02/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business03/02/2021 Referred to
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship04/19/2021 Referred to

As of 06/14/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1487 - Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2021


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1487. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/15/2021)

Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2021

This bill modifies reporting requirements related to the Small Business Administration's (SBA) disbursement of certain financial assistance.

Specifically, the bill requires the SBA to report certain metrics related to the disbursement of microloans to small businesses, including (1) the number, amount, and percentage of such loans that went into default in the previous year; (2) the extent to which microloans are provided to small businesses in rural areas; and (3) the average size, rate of interest, and amount of fees charged for each microloan.