There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Build America’s Libraries Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To support library infrastructure.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/03/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/03/2021Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/03/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/03/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Kahele, Kaiali'i [D-HI-2]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Bowman, Jamaal [D-NY-16]* 03/03/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 03/03/2021
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/08/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/08/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/08/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/08/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/08/2021
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/08/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 03/08/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15] 03/08/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/08/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/08/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/08/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/16/2021
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/16/2021
Rep. Leger Fernandez, Teresa [D-NM-3] 03/16/2021
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/16/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/16/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/16/2021
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/16/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/29/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/29/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/29/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 03/29/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/29/2021
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/29/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/29/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/29/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 03/29/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/29/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/01/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/01/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/01/2021
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 04/01/2021
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/08/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53] 04/08/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/08/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 04/08/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/08/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/08/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/08/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/08/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 04/08/2021
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/08/2021
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/15/2021
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/15/2021
Rep. Manning, Kathy E. [D-NC-6] 04/15/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 04/15/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 04/15/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/04/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/04/2021
Del. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 05/04/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/04/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/04/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 05/04/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/04/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/04/2021
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/13/2021
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/13/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/13/2021
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/13/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/13/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/01/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/01/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/01/2021
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/01/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/01/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1] 06/17/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/17/2021
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 06/17/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 06/17/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/17/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor03/03/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2021)

Build America's Libraries Act

This bill establishes and provides funds through FY2024 for the Build America's Libraries Fund, from which the Institute of Museum and Library Services (IMLS) must allocate funding to states and, through them, need-based grants to libraries to make long-term improvements to library facilities. The IMLS must also award grants to Indian tribes and organizations that primarily serve and represent Native Hawaiians.

Specifically, the bill requires each state that receives an allocation, and each library that receives a grant, to carry out certain activities to improve library facilities. These activities include constructing and renovating library facilities, investing in infrastructure projects to improve internet access and connectivity, improving indoor air quality, and making facilities accessible to individuals with disabilities.

The bill also outlines administrative and oversight provisions, including by requiring library projects to use iron and steel products that are produced in the United States.