There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Postal Vehicle Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize funding for the purchase of electric or zero-emission vehicles for United States Postal Service fleet, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/08/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/08/2021Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/08/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/08/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/08/2021
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/10/2021
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/10/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/10/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/16/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/16/2021
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/16/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/16/2021
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/16/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1] 03/16/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/16/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 04/01/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/01/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/01/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/14/2021
Rep. Bowman, Jamaal [D-NY-16] 04/30/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 05/07/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/08/2021
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/08/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform03/08/2021 Referred to

As of 06/23/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1636 - Postal Vehicle Modernization Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1636. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/2021)

Postal Vehicle Modernization Act

This bill establishes requirements for U.S. Postal Service (USPS) vehicle purchases and charging stations. The bill's provisions only apply if specified funding is appropriated.

Specifically, the bill requires the USPS to ensure that at least 75% of the total number of next generation delivery vehicles purchased using such funds are electric or zero-emission vehicles. The bill provides for a phase-out of medium- and heavy-duty vehicles that are not electric or zero-emission vehicles.

The USPS must provide by January 1, 2026, at each postal facility accessible to the public, at least one electric vehicle charging station for use by the public or USPS officers and employees.