There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VOCA Fix to Sustain the Crime Victims Fund Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

VOCA Fix to Sustain the Crime Victims Fund Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To deposit certain funds into the Crime Victims Fund, to waive matching requirements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/17/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 384 - 38 (Roll no. 89).(text: 3/16/2021 CR H1390-1391)
03/08/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/18/2021SenateReceived in the Senate.
03/17/2021-7:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/17/2021-7:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 384 - 38 (Roll no. 89). (text: 3/16/2021 CR H1390-1391)
03/17/2021-6:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1481-1482)
03/16/2021-4:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/16/2021-4:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1652.
03/16/2021-4:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1390-1393)
03/16/2021-4:18pmHouseMr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/08/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/08/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 03/08/2021
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/08/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Feenstra, Randy [R-IA-4]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/09/2021
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/09/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1] 03/09/2021
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/09/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 03/10/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/10/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/11/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/16/2021
Rep. Owens, Burgess [R-UT-4] 03/16/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 03/16/2021
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/16/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/16/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 03/16/2021
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 03/16/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/16/2021
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/16/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/16/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/16/2021
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 03/16/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/08/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1652. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/17/2021)

VOCA Fix to Sustain the Crime Victims Fund Act of 2021

This bill adds a new source of revenue for the Crime Victims Fund and makes changes to formula grants supported by the fund.

Specifically, the bill directs revenues collected from deferred prosecution and non-prosecution agreements to be deposited into the Crime Victims Fund. Currently, such revenues are deposited into the general fund of the Treasury.

Additionally, the bill increases the percentage—from 60% to 75%—of state compensation payments to crime victims in the prior fiscal year used to calculate formula grants for state victim compensation programs.

Finally, the bill directs states to waive the matching requirement for recipients of state victim assistance formula grants during and for one year after a pandemic-related national emergency. It also allows states to waive the matching requirement pursuant to a policy established by the state.