There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To address behavioral health and well-being among health care professionals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/08/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/08/2021Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 03/08/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/23/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 04/05/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/05/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 04/08/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/08/2021
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2021
Rep. Mrvan, Frank J. [D-IN-1] 04/21/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/22/2021
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 04/22/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/20/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/20/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/20/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/20/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/20/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 05/20/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 05/20/2021
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/20/2021
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 05/20/2021
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/20/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/20/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/20/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 05/20/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/25/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/25/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/25/2021
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 05/25/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/25/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/25/2021
Rep. Manning, Kathy E. [D-NC-6] 05/25/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/28/2021
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/28/2021
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/28/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/28/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/28/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/28/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/28/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/28/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/28/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/28/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/28/2021
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/28/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/04/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/04/2021
Rep. Mann, Tracey [R-KS-1] 06/04/2021
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 06/04/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/04/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/11/2021
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/11/2021
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/11/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/11/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/11/2021
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/11/2021
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/11/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/11/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/11/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/11/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/08/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1667. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/2021)

Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Act

This bill establishes grants and requires other activities to improve mental and behavioral health and prevent burnout among health care providers.

Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must award grants to

  • train health care providers on suicide prevention, other behavioral health issues, and strategies to improve well-being; and
  • establish or expand programs to promote mental and behavioral health among health care providers involved with COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) response efforts.

HHS must also study and develop policy recommendations on

  • preventing burnout and improving mental and behavioral health among health care providers,
  • removing barriers to accessing care and treatment, and
  • identifying strategies to promote resiliency.

Additionally, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention must conduct a campaign to encourage health care providers to seek support and treatment for mental and behavioral health concerns.