There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Financial Inclusion in Banking Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Financial Inclusion in Banking Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to direct the Office of Community Affairs to identify causes leading to, and solutions for, under-banked, un-banked, and underserved consumers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/18/2021Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008.(consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2509-2510)
03/09/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/19/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
05/18/2021-8:01pmHousePursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008. (consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2509-2510)
05/18/2021-8:01pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 403, proceedings on H.R. 1711 are considered vacated.
05/18/2021-12:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/18/2021-12:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1711.
05/18/2021-12:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2450-2452; text: CR H2450)
05/18/2021-12:28pmHouseMr. Cleaver moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/09/2021HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/09/2021HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/09/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 05/17/2021

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services03/09/2021 Referred to
House Budget03/09/2021 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/19/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1711. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/18/2021)

Financial Inclusion in Banking Act of 2021

This bill expands the duties of the Office of Community Affairs within the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau regarding under-banked, un-banked, and underserved consumers. Specifically, the office must (1) report on impeding factors for individuals and families that do not participate in the banking system, and (2) develop strategies to increase such participation.

The bill also decreases, beginning September 30, 2031, the cap on the surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks. (Amounts exceeding this cap are deposited in the general fund of the Treasury.)