There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

DRIVE-SAFE Act
Developing Responsible Individuals for a Vibrant Economy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Transportation to issue regulations relating to commercial motor vehicle drivers under the age of 21, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/10/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/11/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/10/2021Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 03/10/2021
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1]* 03/10/2021
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/15/2021
Rep. Carl, Jerry L. [R-AL-1] 04/15/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/15/2021
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 04/15/2021
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 04/15/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/15/2021
Rep. Mace, Nancy [R-SC-1] 04/15/2021
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 04/15/2021
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 04/15/2021
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/15/2021
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 04/15/2021
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/15/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/15/2021
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 04/15/2021
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/15/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/15/2021
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 04/19/2021
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 04/19/2021
Rep. Rosendale Sr., Matthew M. [R-MT-At Large] 04/19/2021
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/19/2021
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/19/2021
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 04/19/2021
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 04/19/2021
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/19/2021
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/19/2021
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 04/19/2021
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/19/2021
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 04/19/2021
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/19/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/19/2021
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 04/19/2021
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 04/19/2021
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/11/2021
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/11/2021
Rep. Nehls, Troy E. [R-TX-22] 05/11/2021
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/11/2021
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/11/2021
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 05/11/2021
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/11/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/11/2021
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 05/11/2021
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/11/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/11/2021
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/11/2021
Rep. Fischbach, Michelle [R-MN-7] 05/11/2021
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 05/14/2021
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 05/14/2021
Rep. Garbarino, Andrew R. [R-NY-2] 05/14/2021
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/14/2021
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 05/14/2021
Rep. Feenstra, Randy [R-IA-4] 05/14/2021
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 05/14/2021
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/14/2021
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 05/14/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/20/2021
Rep. Steel, Michelle [R-CA-48] 05/20/2021
Rep. Fitzgerald, Scott [R-WI-5] 05/20/2021
Rep. Bice, Stephanie I. [R-OK-5] 05/20/2021
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/20/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 05/20/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/10/2021 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit03/11/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.