There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Indian Tribes from Scams Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protecting Indian Tribes from Scams Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Federal Trade Commission to submit to Congress a report on unfair or deceptive acts or practices targeted at Indian Tribes or members of Indian Tribes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 10 (Roll no. 111).(text: 04/14/2021 CR H1761)
03/10/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/19/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
04/15/2021-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2021-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 10 (Roll no. 111). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1761)
04/15/2021-6:24pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1830-1831)
04/14/2021-1:57pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/14/2021-1:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1762.
04/14/2021-1:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1761-1762)
04/14/2021-1:51pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/11/2021HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/10/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/10/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 03/10/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/10/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce03/11/2021 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/19/2021 Referred to

As of 06/24/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1762 - Protecting Indian Tribes from Scams Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1762. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/15/2021)

Protecting Indian Tribes from Scams Act

This bill requires the Federal Trade Commission (FTC), after consultation with Indian tribes, to report on unfair or deceptive practices that target tribes or tribal members. The FTC must submit the report to Congress and make it publicly available. Further, the FTC must update its website to include information for consumers and businesses on identifying and avoiding unfair or deceptive practices that target tribes or tribal members.