There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Transportation Security Transparency Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the understanding and clarity of Transportation Security Administration policies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/12/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/18/2021Ordered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/18/2021Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/18/2021Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged.
03/13/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/12/2021Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 03/12/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 05/04/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security03/12/2021 Referred to
03/18/2021 Markup by
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security03/13/2021 Referred to
03/18/2021 Discharged from

As of 06/22/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1871 - Transportation Security Transparency Improvement Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1871. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2021)

Transportation Security Transparency Improvement Act

This bill addresses policies of the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) related to sensitive security information and international aviation security.

Among other requirements, the TSA must

  • ensure clear and consistent designation of Sensitive Security Information, including reasonable security justifications for such designation;
  • develop and implement a schedule to regularly review and update TSA Sensitive Security Information Identification guidelines;
  • conduct outreach to relevant stakeholders (e.g., air carriers, airport operators, and state and local law enforcement) that regularly are granted access to Sensitive Security Information to raise awareness of the TSA's policies and guidelines governing the designation and use of Sensitive Security Information; and
  • develop and implement guidelines with respect to last point of departure airports to conduct engagement with foreign partners on the implementation of security directives and emergency amendments.