There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ensuring Compliance Against Drug Diversion Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ensuring Compliance Against Drug Diversion Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for the modification, transfer, and termination of a registration to manufacture, distribute, or dispense controlled substances or list I chemicals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 5 (Roll no. 113).(text: 04/14/2021 CR H1764)
03/16/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/19/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
04/15/2021-8:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2021-8:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 5 (Roll no. 113). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1764)
04/15/2021-7:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1832)
04/14/2021-2:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/14/2021-2:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1899.
04/14/2021-2:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1764-1765)
04/14/2021-2:10pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/17/2021HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/16/2021HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/16/2021HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/16/2021HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/16/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 03/23/2021

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/16/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/17/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary03/16/2021 Referred to
House Budget03/16/2021 Referred to
Senate Judiciary04/19/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1899. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/15/2021)

Ensuring Compliance Against Drug Diversion Act of 2021

This bill provides statutory authority for certain regulations governing the modification, transfer, and termination of a registration to manufacture, distribute, or dispense controlled substances.

It terminates the registration of individuals and entities when they die, cease legal existence, discontinue business, or surrender such registration. It sets forth notification requirements, as well as conditions for transferring or assigning a registration.