There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

EATS Act of 2021
Enhance Access To SNAP Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to treat attendance at an institution of higher education the same as work for the purpose of determining eligibility to participate in the supplemental nutrition assistance program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/16/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/13/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/16/2021Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/16/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/16/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/16/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/16/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/16/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5]* 03/16/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/26/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/26/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 03/26/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/26/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/26/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53] 03/26/2021
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/26/2021
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/08/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/04/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/04/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/04/2021
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/11/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/11/2021
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/11/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/11/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Agriculture03/16/2021 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations05/13/2021 Referred to

As of 06/16/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1919 - EATS Act of 2021


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.