There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/28/2021Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-47.
03/16/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
05/28/2021Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2021Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-47.
03/24/2021Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 3.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/24/2021Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/24/2021Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
03/17/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/16/2021Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/16/2021 Referred to
03/24/2021 Markup by
05/28/2021 Reported by H. Rept. 117-47
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment03/17/2021 Referred to
03/24/2021 Discharged from

As of 06/14/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1921 - To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program, and for other purposes.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1921. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2021)

This bill reauthorizes through FY2026 and revises the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program.

Under the existing program, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must develop and fund projects to restore the ecological health of the basin, which is located in Louisiana and Mississippi. The bill requires the EPA to review and revise the basin's comprehensive conservation and management plan at least once every five years. In addition, the bill eliminates a statement of the basin's size.