There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Fair Care for Vietnam Veterans Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand the list of diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents for which there is a presumption of service connection for veterans who served in the Republic of Vietnam to include hypertension, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/17/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/17/2021Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/17/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 03/17/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/12/2021
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 05/17/2021
Rep. Garbarino, Andrew R. [R-NY-2] 05/28/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs03/17/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1972. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/17/2021)

Fair Care for Vietnam Veterans Act of 2021

This bill provides a presumption of service-connection for hypertension and monoclonal gammopathy of undetermined significance (MGUS) for veterans who served in Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific conditions diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded.