There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Improving Access to Mental Health Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve access to mental health services under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/18/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/18/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/18/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 03/18/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/18/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/18/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/23/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/23/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/23/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/08/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/11/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/11/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/17/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/17/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/17/2021
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 05/28/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/28/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 05/28/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/28/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/08/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/08/2021
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/08/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/15/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/16/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/18/2021 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/18/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/18/2021)

Improving Access to Mental Health Act of 2021

This bill increases the Medicare reimbursement rate for clinical social worker services. The bill excludes clinical social worker services from the prospective payment system in which predetermined amounts form the basis for payment under Medicare.

Additionally, the bill alters the definition of clinical social worker services as it relates to Medicare. Under current law, such services (1) include services performed for the diagnosis and treatment of mental illnesses, and (2) exclude services furnished to an inpatient of a skilled nursing facility as a condition of the facility's participation in the Medicare program. The bill repeals these provisions and instead specifies that such services include certain types of health behavior assessment and intervention.