Text: H.R.2091 — 117th Congress (2021-2022)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/2021)

 
[Congressional Bills 117th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 2091 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






117th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                H. R. 2091

To redesignate the Tyler Bend Visitor Center located on Tyler Bend Road 
 in St. Joe, Arkansas, as the Dr. Neil Compton Visitor Center, and for 
                            other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 19, 2021

  Mr. Hill (for himself, Mr. Westerman, Mr. Womack, and Mr. Crawford) 
 introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on 
                           Natural Resources

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
To redesignate the Tyler Bend Visitor Center located on Tyler Bend Road 
 in St. Joe, Arkansas, as the Dr. Neil Compton Visitor Center, and for 
                            other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Dr. Neil Compton Conservation Act''.

SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    Congress finds the following:
            (1) Dr. Neil Compton, of Benton County, Arkansas, was born 
        on August 1, 1912, in Falling Springs Flats.
            (2) Dr. Neil Compton, from 1942 to 1946 served in the 
        United Sates Naval Reserve with the rank of Lieutenant Junior 
        Grade, Medical Corps, and retired in 1972 with the rank of 
        Captain.
            (3) Dr. Compton, the Founder of Ozark Society, was credited 
        with saving the Buffalo River from being dammed in two places 
        by the Army Corps of Engineers.
            (4) Dr. Compton received numerous awards for his 
        conservation work, including the coveted American Motors 
        Conservation Award on May 20, 1964, as well as the 
        Distinguished Arkansas Conservationist award from the Sears 
        Roebuck Foundation and the National and Arkansas Wildlife 
        Federation, both of which were presented on November 17, 1966.
            (5) In l982, Dr. Compton wrote The High Ozarks: A Vision of 
        Eden, featuring photographs he made during his favorite Ozark 
        explorations. This was followed in 1992 by The Battle for the 
        Buffalo River: A Conservation Crisis in the Ozarks, published 
        by the University of Arkansas Press, which was nominated for 
        the National Book Award, and The Buffalo River in Black and 
        White (Ozark Society Books, 1997).
            (6) Fifty years ago, Dr. Compton played an integral part in 
        having the Buffalo National River named the first national 
        river in 1972 during the 91st Congress.

SEC. 3. REDESIGNATION.

    (a) In General.--The Tyler Bend Visitor Center located on Tyler 
Bend Road in St. Joe, Arkansas, shall be known and redesignated as the 
``Dr. Neil Compton Visitor Center''.
    (b) References.--Any reference in a law, map, regulation, document, 
paper, or other record of the United States to the visitor center 
referred to in subsection (a) shall be deemed to be a reference to the 
Dr. Neil Compton Visitor Center.

SEC. 4. INFORMATIONAL DISPLAY.

    The Secretary of the Interior may display information at the Dr. 
Neil Compton Visitor Center to educate the public about the 
contributions of Dr. Neil Compton to the history of the Buffalo 
National River.
                                 <all>

Share This