There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

SACKLER Act
Stop shielding Assets from Corporate Known Liability by Eliminating non-debtor Releases Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the non-consensual release of claims by States, municipalities, federally recognized Tribes, or the United States against non-debtors, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/19/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/16/2021Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1879)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/19/2021
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/05/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/05/2021
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 04/13/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/13/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 04/13/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/13/2021
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15] 04/13/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1] 04/13/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/13/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/13/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/13/2021
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 04/13/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/13/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/13/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/13/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/13/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/13/2021
Rep. Bowman, Jamaal [D-NY-16] 04/13/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/13/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/15/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/15/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/16/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/16/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/19/2021
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/19/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/21/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/21/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17] 05/07/2021
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 05/07/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/13/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/14/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/14/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/14/2021
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/17/2021
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/28/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/28/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/28/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/28/2021
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/28/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/28/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 06/04/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/04/2021
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/04/2021
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/04/2021
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/08/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/08/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/08/2021
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/11/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/22/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 06/22/2021
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/24/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/24/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/24/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/19/2021 Referred to

As of 07/27/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2096 - SACKLER Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.