There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Housing Supply and Affordability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a grant program for the development and implementation of housing supply and affordability plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/23/2021Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2021Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 03/23/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/23/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 04/16/2021
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/28/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 04/30/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/04/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 05/07/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 05/11/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/11/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 05/18/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/28/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/28/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/08/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/08/2021
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/08/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/08/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/08/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2021
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/11/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/11/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/11/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/14/2021
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 06/16/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 06/16/2021
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2021
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2021
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/21/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/21/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/21/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/21/2021
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/22/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/22/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/24/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/28/2021
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/30/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/01/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/06/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/16/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/21/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/22/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/30/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services03/23/2021 Referred to
House Budget03/23/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2126. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/2021)

Housing Supply and Affordability Act

This bill allows the Department of Housing and Urban Development to award grants to states, local governments, Indian tribes, and Native Hawaiian organizations for the development and implementation of housing policy plans. These plans must increase the housing supply while avoiding resident displacement, increase housing affordability, and reduce barriers to housing development.

The amounts provided by the bill are designated as an emergency requirement pursuant to the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 (PAYGO) and the Senate PAYGO rule. (This excludes the budget effects from being counted for the purposes of enforcing the PAYGO rules.)