There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Daylight Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow States to elect to observe daylight savings time for the duration of the year, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/02/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/05/2021Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 03/08/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/16/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/16/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/05/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce02/02/2021 Referred to

As of 08/02/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.214 - Daylight Act


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.214. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/2021)

Daylight Act

This bill allows states to observe daylight savings time year-round. (States may already choose to observe standard time year-round.)