There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Break Free From Plastic Pollution Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Solid Waste Disposal Act to reduce the production and use of certain single-use plastic products and packaging, to improve the responsibility of producers in the design, collection, reuse, recycling, and disposal of their consumer products and packaging, to prevent pollution from consumer products and packaging from entering into animal and human food chains and waterways, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
03/29/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/29/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/26/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/26/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/26/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/26/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/26/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/26/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/26/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Kahele, Kaiali'i [D-HI-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Leger Fernandez, Teresa [D-NM-3]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/26/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/01/2021
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 04/01/2021
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/01/2021
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/08/2021
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/13/2021
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 04/13/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/17/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/17/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/17/2021
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/17/2021
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/19/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15] 05/25/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/08/2021
Rep. Bowman, Jamaal [D-NY-16] 06/14/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/17/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/29/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 07/06/2021
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/06/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/20/2021

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change03/29/2021 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/26/2021 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/26/2021 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment03/29/2021 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs03/26/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (58)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.