There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Historic Tax Credit Growth and Opportunity Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the rehabilitation credit for certain small projects, to eliminate the requirement that the taxpayer's basis in a building be reduced by the amount of the rehabilitation credit determined with respect to such building, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/01/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/01/2021Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2021Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E324)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 04/01/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/01/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/01/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/08/2021
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/08/2021
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/12/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/14/2021
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 04/14/2021
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/14/2021
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 04/14/2021
Rep. Bice, Stephanie I. [R-OK-5] 04/16/2021
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 04/16/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/19/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/21/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/22/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/22/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/22/2021
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/28/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 04/28/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/28/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/28/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 04/28/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/28/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/28/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/04/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 05/07/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/11/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/11/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 05/12/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/12/2021
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/13/2021
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/13/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 05/18/2021
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 05/19/2021
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/19/2021
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/19/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/28/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/28/2021
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/04/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/04/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2021
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/04/2021
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 06/08/2021
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/08/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means04/01/2021 Referred to

As of 06/15/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2294 - Historic Tax Credit Growth and Opportunity Act of 2021


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.