There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Title X Abortion Provider Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title X of the Public Health Service Act to prohibit family planning grants from being awarded to any entity that performs abortions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/02/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Pfluger, August [R-TX-11]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Feenstra, Randy [R-IA-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Harshbarger, Diana [R-TN-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Fischbach, Michelle [R-MN-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Jackson, Ronny [R-TX-13]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Moore, Barry [R-AL-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Carl, Jerry L. [R-AL-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Cammack, Kat [R-FL-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Franklin, C. Scott [R-FL-15]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Boebert, Lauren [R-CO-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/12/2021
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/12/2021
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/12/2021
Rep. Clyde, Andrew S. [R-GA-9] 01/12/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17] 01/12/2021
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 01/13/2021
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 01/15/2021
Rep. Good, Bob [R-VA-5] 01/15/2021
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 01/15/2021
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 01/25/2021
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 01/25/2021
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/25/2021
Rep. Rosendale Sr., Matthew M. [R-MT-At Large] 01/25/2021
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 01/25/2021
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 01/28/2021
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/11/2021
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/24/2021
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/10/2021
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 03/26/2021
Rep. Miller, Mary E. [R-IL-15] 04/15/2021
Rep. Letlow, Julia [R-LA-5] 04/20/2021
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/21/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/11/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/02/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.243. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2021)

Title X Abortion Provider Prohibition Act

This bill prohibits the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) from awarding family planning grants to entities that perform abortions or provide funding to other entities that perform abortions. To receive a grant, an entity must certify it will refrain from those activities during the grant period.

The bill provides exceptions for abortions (1) in cases of rape or incest; or (2) when the life of the woman is in danger due to a physical disorder, injury, or illness. It also exempts hospitals unless they provide funds to non-hospital entities that provide abortions.

HHS must report annually on this prohibition.