Text: H.R.2569 — 117th Congress (2021-2022)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/15/2021)


117th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2569


To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a presumption of service connection for diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents for veterans who served in close proximity to the Republic of Vietnam, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

April 15, 2021

Mr. Cartwright (for himself, Mr. Fitzpatrick, Mr. Morelle, Mr. O'Halleran, Ms. Norton, Ms. Titus, Mr. Sires, Mrs. Hayes, Ms. Tlaib, Mr. Pascrell, Mr. Lawson of Florida, Mr. Carson, and Mr. Kilmer) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs


A BILL

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a presumption of service connection for diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents for veterans who served in close proximity to the Republic of Vietnam, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Veterans Agent Orange Exposure Equity Act”.

SEC. 2. Presumptions of service connection for diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents for veterans who served in close proximity to the Republic of Vietnam.

(a) In general.—Section 1116 of title 38, United States Code, is amended—

(1) by striking “, during active military, naval, or air service, served in the Republic of Vietnam during the period beginning on January 9, 1962, and ending on May 7, 1975” each place it appears and inserting “performed covered service”;

(2) by striking “performed active military, naval, or air service in the Republic of Vietnam during the period beginning on January 9, 1962, and ending on May 7, 1975” each place it appears and inserting “performed covered service”;

(3) by striking subsections (b) through (e) and redesignating subsection (f) as subsection (b); and

(4) by adding at the end the following new subsection:

“(c) In this section, the term ‘covered service’ means active military, naval, or air service—

“(1) performed in the Republic of Vietnam during the period beginning on January 9, 1962, and ending on May 7, 1975;

“(2) performed in Thailand—

“(A) at a United States Army base or Royal Thai Air Force base during the period beginning on January 9, 1962, and ending on May 7, 1975; or

“(B) at the Royal Thai Army Replacement Training Center, Pranburi Military Reservation during the period beginning January 1, 1964, and ending on April 30, 1964;

“(3) performed in Laos during the period beginning on December 1, 1965, and ending on September 30, 1969; or

“(4) performed in Cambodia at Mimot or Krek, Kompon Cham Province during the period beginning on April 16, 1969, and ending on April 30, 1969.”.

(b) Clerical amendments.—

(1) SECTION HEADING.—The heading for section 1116 is amended by inserting “, or in close proximity to,” before “the Republic of Vietnam”.

(2) TABLE OF SECTIONS.—The table of sections at the beginning of chapter 11 of such title is amended by striking the item relating to section 1116 and inserting the following new item:


“1116. Presumptions of service connection for diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents; presumption of exposure for veterans who served in, or in close proximity to, the Republic of Vietnam”.


Share This