There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

End Diaper Need Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to address the increased burden that maintaining the health and hygiene of infants and toddlers places on families in need, the resultant adverse health effects on children and families, and the limited child care options available for infants and toddlers who lack sufficient diapers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/02/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/11/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/11/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/01/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 02/01/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/01/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/01/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/01/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/01/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/01/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 02/01/2021
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/18/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 02/18/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/23/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/23/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 03/23/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/23/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 03/23/2021
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/23/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/23/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 03/23/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/08/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/08/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/08/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/08/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/08/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/08/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/08/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/11/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/02/2021 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/11/2021 Referred to

As of 04/13/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.259 - End Diaper Need Act of 2021


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.