There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Behavioral Intervention Guidelines Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Behavioral Intervention Guidelines Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to develop best practices for the establishment and use of behavioral intervention teams at schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/13/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 323 - 93, 2 Present (Roll no. 142).(text: 05/11/2021 CR H2167)
04/28/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/17/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/13/2021-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/13/2021-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 323 - 93, 2 Present (Roll no. 142). (text: 05/11/2021 CR H2167)
05/13/2021-4:10pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2295-2296)
05/11/2021-3:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/11/2021-3:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2877.
05/11/2021-3:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2167-2168)
05/11/2021-2:59pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/29/2021HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/28/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/28/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/28/2021
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/28/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 04/28/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/28/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/29/2021 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/17/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.