There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 36, United States Code, to establish the composition known as "Lift Every Voice and Sing" as the national hymn of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/13/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15]* 01/13/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1] 01/15/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 01/19/2021
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 01/21/2021
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 02/01/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/13/2021 Referred to

As of 03/03/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.301 - To amend title 36, United States Code, to establish the composition known as "Lift Every Voice and Sing" as the national hymn of the United States.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2021)

This bill designates the composition consisting of the words and music known as "Lift Every Voice and Sing" as the national hymn of the United States.