There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Secure U.S. Capitol Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Architect of the Capitol to design and install an appropriate fence around the perimeter of the United States Capitol, including the East Front and the West Front.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/15/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/04/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/15/2021Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/15/2021 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management02/04/2021 Referred to

As of 04/17/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.339 - Secure U.S. Capitol Act


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.339. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/15/2021)

Secure U.S. Capitol Act

This bill directs the Architect of the Capitol to install permanent fencing around the perimeter of the U.S. Capitol, taking into account specified factors relating to safety, security, access, and overall design. The fencing must be installed by January 1, 2023.

On January 7, 2021, in response to the previous day's events, razor wire fencing was erected to secure the perimeter of the U.S. Capitol; the fencing is to remain in place for 30 days, with possible extensions.