There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

SUPPLIES Act
Shoring Up Personal Protective and Lifesaving Indispensable Equipment Stockpile Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program providing grants to certain small business concerns to modify or reallocate their productive facilities to begin or increase production of certain medical supplies critical to addressing the COVID-19 pandemic, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/19/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/19/2021Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/19/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/04/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/04/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/19/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/19/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 03/19/2021
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 03/19/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business01/19/2021 Referred to

As of 05/07/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.346 - SUPPLIES Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.346. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/19/2021)

Shoring Up Personal Protective and Lifesaving Indispensable Equipment Stockpile Act or the SUPPLIES Act

This bill establishes a temporary grant program to assist small businesses in producing covered goods (e.g., ventilators, surgical masks, and hand sanitizer) that are needed to address the national emergency related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

A grant recipient must prioritize the domestic sale of covered goods and refrain from selling such goods at a price that grossly exceeds the average price for the 90-day period prior to January 31, 2020.