There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Seniors from Emergency Scams Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protecting Seniors from Emergency Scams Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Federal Trade Commission to submit a report to Congress on scams targeting seniors, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 8 (Roll no. 110).(text: 04/14/2021 CR H1760)
01/25/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/19/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
04/15/2021-6:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2021-6:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 8 (Roll no. 110). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1760)
04/15/2021-5:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1829-1830)
04/14/2021-1:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/14/2021-1:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 446.
04/14/2021-1:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1760-1761)
04/14/2021-1:42pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/02/2021HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/25/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/25/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/25/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce02/02/2021 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/19/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.446. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/15/2021)

Protecting Seniors from Emergency Scams Act

This bill requires the Federal Trade Commission to report on, and increase awareness regarding, scams targeting older adults. Specifically, the commission must

  • report on the number and type of scams that target older adults and provide policy recommendations to prevent such scams;
  • revise the commission's web portal with current information about such scams, including contact information for law enforcement and adult protective services agencies; and
  • coordinate with media outlets and law enforcement to disseminate such information.