There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protecting Patient Access to Lifesaving COVID–19 Drugs Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Families First Coronavirus Response Act and the CARES Act to require group health plans and health insurance issuers offering group or individual health insurance coverage to provide coverage, without cost sharing, of certain COVID-19 antibody treatments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/25/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
02/02/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2021Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 01/25/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/23/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 04/30/2021

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/25/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/02/2021 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/25/2021 Referred to
House Education and Labor01/25/2021 Referred to

As of 05/15/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.467 - Protecting Patient Access to Lifesaving COVID–19 Drugs Act of 2021


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.467. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/2021)

Protecting Patient Access to Lifesaving COVID-19 Drugs Act of 2021

This bill requires health insurance plans to cover COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) antibody treatment at no cost for individuals who have tested positive for the virus.