There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To regulate monitoring of electronic communications between an incarcerated person in a Bureau of Prisons facility and that person's attorney or other legal representative, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/24/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 11 (Roll no. 36).(text: 02/23/2020 CR H557-558)
01/28/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/25/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
02/24/2021-5:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/24/2021-5:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 11 (Roll no. 36). (text: 02/23/2020 CR H557-558)
02/24/2021-4:27pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H610-611)
02/23/2021-5:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/23/2021-4:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 546.
02/23/2021-4:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H557-560)
02/23/2021-4:51pmHouseMs. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/28/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/28/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/28/2021 Referred to
Senate Judiciary02/25/2021 Referred to

As of 05/05/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.546 - Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/24/2021)

Effective Assistance of Counsel in the Digital Era Act

This bill prohibits the Department of Justice from monitoring the contents of a privileged electronic communication between an incarcerated person and his or her legal representative.