There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish an interagency program to assist countries in North and West Africa to improve immediate and long-term capabilities to counter terrorist threats, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 15 (Roll no. 192).(text: 06/28/2021 CR H3171-3173)
01/28/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/12/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
06/29/2021-3:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/29/2021-3:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 15 (Roll no. 192). (text: 06/28/2021 CR H3171-3173)
06/29/2021-2:38pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3262-3263)
06/28/2021-3:27pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/28/2021-3:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 567.
06/28/2021-3:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3171-3174)
06/28/2021-3:20pmHouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/25/2021HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/25/2021HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/28/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/28/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/28/2021 Referred to
02/25/2021 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations07/12/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.567. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/28/2021)

Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program Act of 2021

This bill provides statutory authority for the Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Program, an interagency program launched in 2005 to partner with countries in the Sahel and Maghreb regions of Africa to counter terrorism and violent extremism.

The Department of State, in consultation with the Department of Defense and the U.S. Agency for International Development, shall establish the partnership program, which must coordinate all U.S. programs in North and West Africa related to various counterterrorism activities, such as building foreign-military capacity, enhancing border security, promoting youth employment, and supporting independent media to counter terrorist propaganda.

The State Department must submit comprehensive, five-year strategies that include specified activities for the Sahel and Maghreb regions and for program counterterrorism efforts. Further, program activities must, among other things (1) be carried out in countries where there is an adequate level of partner country committment, and (2) have clearly defined outcomes and specific plans with indicators to regularly monitor and evaluate outcomes and impact. Such activities must also take into account the counterterrorism and development strategies of partner countries and align with such strategies to the extent possible.

The State Department shall notify Congress before obligating funds for such programs, and must submit annual reports about program activities.