There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote accountability and transparency in future executive orders.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/22/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/02/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 02/05/2021
Rep. LaTurner, Jake [R-KS-2] 02/05/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 03/10/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/02/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties03/22/2021 Referred to

As of 05/12/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.716 - To promote accountability and transparency in future executive orders.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.716. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2021)

This bill requires the President to notify Congress and the public before issuing executive orders relating to the constitutional right of law-abiding individuals in the United States to own, carry, and use firearms.