There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mental Health Services for Students Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Mental Health Services for Students Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend projects relating to children and to provide access to school-based comprehensive mental health programs.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/12/2021Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981.(consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2237)
02/02/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/13/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/12/2021-5:38pmHousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981. (consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2237)
05/12/2021-5:38pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 380, proceedings on H.R. 721 are considered vacated.
05/11/2021-2:59pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/11/2021-2:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 721.
05/11/2021-2:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2165-2167; text: CR H2165-2166)
05/11/2021-2:53pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/03/2021HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/02/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/02/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/2021
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/02/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 02/02/2021
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 02/02/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/02/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/02/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/04/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/04/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 02/04/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/04/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/11/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/11/2021
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 02/18/2021
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/18/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/22/2021
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 02/22/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/22/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 02/24/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/25/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/26/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 03/02/2021
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/16/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/16/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2021
Rep. Mrvan, Frank J. [D-IN-1] 04/05/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/05/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/12/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 05/11/2021
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 05/11/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/02/2021 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/03/2021 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/13/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.721. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/12/2021)

Mental Health Services for Students Act of 2021

This bill provides specific statutory authority for the Project AWARE (Advancing Wellness and Resiliency in Education) State Educational Agency Grant Program that is administered by the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration. The program supports school-based mental health services, including screening, treatment, and outreach programs.