There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 229 Minnetonka Avenue South in Wayzata, Minnesota, as the "Jim Ramstad Post Office".


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/23/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H555)
02/03/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/24/2021SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/23/2021-4:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/23/2021-4:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H555)
02/23/2021-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 772.
02/23/2021-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H554-555)
02/23/2021-4:23pmHouseMr. Mfume moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/12/2021HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
02/12/2021HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
02/03/2021HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
02/03/2021HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 02/03/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 02/03/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/03/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/03/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 02/03/2021
Rep. Fischbach, Michelle [R-MN-7]* 02/03/2021
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 02/03/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform02/03/2021 Referred to
02/12/2021 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/24/2021 Referred to

As of 05/12/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.772 - To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 229 Minnetonka Avenue South in Wayzata, Minnesota, as the "Jim Ramstad Post Office".


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.772. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2021)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 229 Minnetonka Avenue South in Wayzata, Minnesota, as the "Jim Ramstad Post Office."