There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

United States-Israel PTSD Collaborative Research Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Defense to carry out a grant program to increase cooperation on post-traumatic stress disorder research between the United States and Israel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/04/2021Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 02/04/2021
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 02/04/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 02/04/2021
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 02/04/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 02/04/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/05/2021
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 02/05/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/05/2021
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 02/05/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/05/2021
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/05/2021
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/05/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/05/2021
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 02/11/2021
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/11/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/11/2021
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/11/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/11/2021
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/11/2021
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/11/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/11/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 02/15/2021
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/15/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/15/2021
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 02/18/2021
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 02/18/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/18/2021
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/24/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/24/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/25/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/26/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/01/2021
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 03/03/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 03/16/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 03/16/2021
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/17/2021
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/17/2021
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 03/17/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/17/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 03/17/2021
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/17/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/18/2021
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/19/2021
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/19/2021
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 03/26/2021
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 03/26/2021
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/26/2021
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 04/05/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 04/05/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/05/2021
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/05/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 04/05/2021
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 04/13/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/13/2021
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 04/14/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17] 04/15/2021
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/16/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services02/04/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.852. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2021)

United States-Israel PTSD Collaborative Research Act

This bill establishes a grant program for collaborative efforts between the United States and Israel to advance research on post-traumatic stress disorders.

The Department of Defense, in coordination with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of State, shall award grants to eligible academic institutions or nonprofit entities in the United States.

Work shall be conducted by the eligible entity and an entity in Israel under a joint research agreement.