There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

GYMS Act of 2021
Gym Mitigation and Survival Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Administrator of the Small Business Administration to establish a grant program for certain fitness facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/05/2021Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (149)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/05/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 02/05/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 02/05/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 02/05/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 02/08/2021
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/08/2021
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2021
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 02/11/2021
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/11/2021
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/11/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 02/11/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17] 02/11/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/18/2021
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/18/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/18/2021
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 02/18/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 02/18/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/18/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/18/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/18/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/18/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/18/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 02/22/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 02/22/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/22/2021
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/22/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/22/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/22/2021
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 02/22/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/25/2021
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 02/25/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/25/2021
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 02/25/2021
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 02/25/2021
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/25/2021
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 02/25/2021
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 02/25/2021
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 02/25/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 03/02/2021
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/02/2021
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/02/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/02/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/02/2021
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 03/02/2021
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 03/02/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/2021
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/10/2021
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/10/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/10/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 03/10/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/10/2021
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/10/2021
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/10/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/26/2021
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 03/26/2021
Rep. Mann, Tracey [R-KS-1] 03/26/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/26/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/26/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/26/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/26/2021
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/26/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/26/2021
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/26/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/26/2021
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 03/26/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2021
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 03/26/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/01/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/01/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/01/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/01/2021
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/14/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15] 04/14/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/14/2021
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/14/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/14/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/20/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2021
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/20/2021
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/20/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/20/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/20/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/20/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/21/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/21/2021
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/21/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/21/2021
Rep. Leger Fernandez, Teresa [D-NM-3] 04/28/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/28/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/28/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/28/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/28/2021
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/28/2021
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/28/2021
Rep. LaTurner, Jake [R-KS-2] 04/28/2021
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/11/2021
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/11/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 05/11/2021
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/11/2021
Rep. Malliotakis, Nicole [R-NY-11] 05/11/2021
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/11/2021
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/11/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/12/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/13/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2021
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/17/2021
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/17/2021
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/17/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/17/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/17/2021
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/17/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53] 05/19/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/21/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/21/2021
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/21/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/28/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 05/28/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 05/28/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/28/2021
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/28/2021
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 06/08/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/08/2021
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/08/2021
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 06/16/2021
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/16/2021
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/16/2021
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/16/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 06/17/2021
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 06/17/2021
Rep. Garbarino, Andrew R. [R-NY-2] 06/17/2021
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2021
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/24/2021
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/29/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/29/2021
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 07/09/2021
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/09/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/09/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/26/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/29/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business02/05/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.890. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2021)

Gym Mitigation and Survival Act of 2021 or the GYMS Act of 2021

This bill establishes a grant program to provide economic support to eligible fitness facilities in response to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.

Specifically, the bill authorizes the Small Business Administration to make initial and supplemental grants to privately owned fitness facilities that primarily provide health or fitness services and that do not offer golf, hunting, sailing, or riding facilities. The total amount of grant funds for a recipient may not exceed $25 million, and the recipient must use these funds for payroll costs, rent or mortgage obligations, and other ordinary and necessary business expenses.