There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Dental Care for Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish dental care in the same manner as any other medical service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/08/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/22/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/08/2021Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/08/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/08/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 02/18/2021
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/18/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/18/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 02/18/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/24/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/24/2021
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 02/24/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/24/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/08/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/08/2021
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/17/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/17/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 04/08/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 04/08/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 04/08/2021
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/04/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2021
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/07/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs02/08/2021 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/22/2021 Referred to

As of 05/15/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.R.914 - Dental Care for Veterans Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.914. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2021)

Dental Care for Veterans Act

This bill expands eligibility for veterans for dental care provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Specifically, the bill makes all veterans who are enrolled in the VA health care system eligible for VA-provided dental services. Currently, only veterans who have a service-connected dental issue or meet other narrow criteria are eligible for certain dental services.

The bill phases in eligibility over four years based upon existing eligibility, degree of service-connected disability or other disability, prisoner of war status, award of a Purple Heart, financial need, or VA health care eligibility.