There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the difficult challenges Black veterans faced when returning home after serving in the Armed Forces, their heroic military sacrifices, and their patriotism in fighting for equal rights and for the dignity of a people and a Nation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/01/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/01/2021Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/01/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/01/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/03/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/03/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/03/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/03/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/03/2021
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 02/03/2021
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/11/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/11/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/11/2021
Rep. Bourdeaux, Carolyn [D-GA-7] 02/22/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs02/01/2021 Referred to

As of 05/07/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.Con.Res.13 - Recognizing the difficult challenges Black veterans faced when returning home after serving in the Armed Forces, their heroic military sacrifices, and their patriotism in fighting for equal rights and for the dignity of a people and a Nation.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.13. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2021)

This concurrent resolution recognizes the difficult challenges Black veterans faced when returning home after serving in the Armed Forces, their heroic military sacrifices, and their patriotism in fighting for equal rights and for the dignity of a people and a nation. The concurrent resolution also recognizes the need for the Department of Veterans Affairs to continue to work to eliminate any health and benefit disparities for minority veterans.