There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to contributions and expenditures intended to affect elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/04/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/04/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2021Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/04/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/04/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 01/04/2021
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/21/2021
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/21/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/21/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/21/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 01/21/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/21/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/21/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 01/21/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/21/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 01/21/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/21/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/21/2021
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2021
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/21/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 01/21/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 01/21/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/21/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15] 01/21/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2021
Rep. Kahele, Kaiali'i [D-HI-2] 01/21/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 01/21/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 01/21/2021
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/21/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/21/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/21/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/21/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/21/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/21/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/21/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/21/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/21/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/21/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/21/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/21/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/21/2021
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/21/2021
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 01/21/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 01/21/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 01/21/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/04/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/04/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/04/2021
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/04/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/04/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/04/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/04/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/04/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/2021
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/04/2021
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/2021
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/04/2021
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/04/2021
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 02/04/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 02/04/2021
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/23/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/23/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/23/2021
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/19/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 03/19/2021
Rep. Auchincloss, Jake [D-MA-4] 03/19/2021
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/08/2021
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/08/2021
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/08/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/04/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties03/04/2021 Referred to

As of 04/13/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.J.Res.1 - Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to contributions and expenditures intended to affect elections.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.1. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/04/2021)

This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing Congress and the states to set reasonable limits on the raising and spending of money by candidates and others to influence elections.

The amendment grants Congress and the states the power to implement and enforce this amendment by legislation. They are allowed to distinguish between natural persons and corporations or other artificial entities created by law, including by prohibiting such entities from spending money to influence elections.